IL SB3051 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-15 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Retail Electric Competition Act of 2006 of the Public Utility Act. Provides that the Illinois Commerce Commission may establish a program for promoting expanded use of energy saving programs for residential and small commercial customers. Provides that on or before September 1, 2018 and every 2 years thereafter, the Commission shall initiate a collaborative workshop for certain individuals developing energy savings devices and applications. Provides that any recommendations arising from the workshop shall be included in the annual report of the Office of Retail Market Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UTILITY-ENERGY SAVING PROGRAMS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-14HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-11-14HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 014-006-000
2018-11-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Public Utilities Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-11-12HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-11-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee
2018-11-09HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-11-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-11-07HouseAssigned to Public Utilities Committee
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-10HouseTo Regulatory Matters Subcommittee
2018-05-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Public Utilities Committee
2018-05-01HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-04-23HouseArrived in House
2018-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 045-000-000
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 009-000-000
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Energy and Public Utilities
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
220520-140New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback