IL SB3049 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-7)
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to reimburse psychiatrists, federally qualified health centers as defined in the Social Security Act, clinical psychologists, clinical social workers, advanced practice registered nurses certified in psychiatric and mental health nursing, and mental health professionals and clinicians authorized by Illinois law to provide mental health services to recipients via telehealth (rather than psychiatrists and federally qualified health centers). Requires the Department to reimburse any Medicaid certified eligible facility or provider organization that acts as the location of the patient at the time a telehealth service is rendered, including substance abuse centers licensed by the Department of Human Services' Division of Alcoholism and Substance Abuse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAID-TELEHEALTH SERVICES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-21SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1019
2018-08-21SenateEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-21SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-22SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-05-25SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-007-000
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 017-000-000
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Mental Health Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-02HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-05-02HouseArrived in House
2018-05-01SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-001
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Human Services; 009-000-000
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-5.25Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback