IL SB3047 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Grow Your Own STEM and Vocational Education Teachers Act. Requires a public university to waive any tuition, fees, and on-campus housing costs of a student who agrees to pursue a minimum of a bachelor's degree in science, technology, engineering, or mathematics for a teaching occupation that includes, but is not limited to, mathematics, natural sciences, or career and vocational education in the areas of technology teacher, industrial arts teacher, trade teacher, health care teacher, or information technology teacher and maintains a 3.0 cumulative grade point average. Provides that the student shall agree to fully reimburse the public university if the student fails to teach at least 3 years at an Illinois high school or at least 5 years at an Illinois public institution of higher education. Provides for funding. Requires the Board of Higher Education to adopt rules it determines are necessary for the administration of the Act. Effective July 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GROW STEM TEACHERS ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
2018-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-04-27HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 038-005-000
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted; Manar
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Manar
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Manar
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 007-000-000
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 010-001-000
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Higher Education
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Higher Education
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Higher Education
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Higher Education; 013-000-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2018-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2018-03-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Higher Education
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback