IL SB3047 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Grow Your Own STEM and Vocational Education Teachers Act. Requires a public university to waive any tuition, fees, and on-campus housing costs of a student who agrees to pursue a minimum of a bachelor's degree in science, technology, engineering, or mathematics for a teaching occupation that includes, but is not limited to, mathematics, natural sciences, or career and vocational education in the areas of technology teacher, industrial arts teacher, trade teacher, health care teacher, or information technology teacher and maintains a 3.0 cumulative grade point average. Provides that the student shall agree to fully reimburse the public university if the student fails to teach at least 3 years at an Illinois high school or at least 5 years at an Illinois public institution of higher education. Provides for funding. Requires the Board of Higher Education to adopt rules it determines are necessary for the administration of the Act. Effective July 1, 2020.
Title
GROW STEM TEACHERS ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-04-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-04-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 038-005-000 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted; Manar |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Manar |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Manar |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 007-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 010-001-000 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Higher Education |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Higher Education |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Higher Education |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Higher Education; 013-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |