IL SB3046 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Employee Group Insurance Act of 1971. Provides that on and after the effective date of this amendatory Act, eligible TRS benefit recipients, TRS dependent beneficiaries, community college benefit recipients, and community college dependent beneficiaries may elect not to participate in the program of health benefits under the Act. Provides that the election must be made during the benefit recipient's annual open enrollment period, subject to specified conditions. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE INSURANCE-ENROLLMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 005-000-000
2018-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2018-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Andy Manar
2018-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2018
2018-05-25SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-011-002
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-006-000
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel & Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-07HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-05-03HouseArrived in House
2018-05-02SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass State Government; 008-000-000
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
53756.5Amended CodeCitation Text
53756.9Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback