IL SB3045 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. For the period beginning July 1, 2018 through June 30, 2020, increases the amount of employment as a teacher that a retired teacher may perform without impairing retirement status; allows 120 paid days or 600 paid hours in a school year, but not more than 100 paid days in the same classroom. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-TRS-RETURN TO SERVICE
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant [D] | Sen. Chuck Weaver [R] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] |
Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] | Sen. Omar Aquino [D] | Rep. Monica Bristow [D] | Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-05-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-05-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-05-29 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Community College Access & Affordability Committee; 006-003-000 |
2018-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Community College Access & Affordability Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Community College Access & Affordability Committee |
2018-05-23 | House | Re-assigned to Community College Access & Affordability Committee |
2018-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-22 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2018-05-21 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2018-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 008-000-000 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 16-118 | Amended Code | Citation Text |