IL SB3040 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Common Interest Community Association Act and the Condominium Property Act. Defines "acceptable technological means" and "electronic transmission". Provides that "prescribed delivery method" includes electronic transmission. Provides that electronic votes are valid for the purpose of establishing a quorum. Provides that an association may conduct elections by electronic or acceptable technological means and adds provisions concerning the procedure for conducting such elections. Deletes provisions concerning secret ballots. Provides that, with exceptions, any notice required to be sent or received or signature, vote, consent, or approval required to be obtained may be accomplished using the most advanced technology available at that time. Provides that a verifiable electronic signature satisfies any requirement for a signature. Provides that no action need be acknowledged before a notary public if the identity and signature of the person can otherwise be authenticated to the satisfaction of the board of directors. Provides that if a person does not have the capability or desire to conduct business using electronic transmission or other equivalent technological means, the common interest community association shall make reasonable accommodation, at its expense, for the person to conduct business with the association without the use of electronic or other means. Provides that certain common interest community associations having 10 units or less (instead of "either (i) 10 units or less or (ii) annual budgeted assessments of $100,000 or less") are exempt from the Common Interest Community Association Act.
Title
HOMEOWNERS: E-VOTING, E-NOTICE
Sponsors
Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] | Sen. Michael Hastings [D] | Sen. William Haine [D] | Sen. John Mulroe [D] |
Sen. Kirk Dillard [R] | Rep. Kelly Burke [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-03 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly Burke |
2014-04-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 3, 2014 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Raoul |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 19, 2014 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 27, 2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 160 | 1-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 160 | 1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 160 | 1-75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 160 | 1-85 | New Code | See Bill Text |
765 | 605 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 605 | 18.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
765 | 605 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |