IL SB3037 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Real Estate License Act of 2000. Removes specified caps for recovery from the Real Estate Recovery Fund and provides that the caps shall be decided by rule. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation may expend moneys from the Fund to procure and pay the premium for a bond, insurance, or other indemnity product in amounts to be determined by the Department in order to compensate an aggrieved person for all or part of his or her loss of money due to a violation of the Act or to fund a program of self-insurance in order to compensate an aggrieved person for all or part of his or her loss of money due to a violation of the Act. Removes provisions permitting an aggrieved party to seek a post-judgment order from the Fund and makes related changes. Replaces references to an aggrieved party seeking a judgment to recover from the Fund with references to an aggrieved party filing a claim to recover from the Fund, and makes similar changes. Makes other changes to provisions concerning collection from the Fund. Repeals a provision concerning the Department's power to defend against actions for collection from the Fund. Effective January 1, 2019.
Title
REAL ESTATE RECOVERY FUND
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 454 | 20-100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 20-85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 20-90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 20-95 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3037&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3037.htm |