IL SB3036 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0823
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0823
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act. Provides that at the discretion of the court, a child support obligation may be secured, in whole or in part, by reasonably affordable life insurance on the life of one or both parents on such terms as the parties agree or as the court orders. Provides that contemplation or foreseeability of future events shall not be considered as a factor or used as a defense in determining whether a substantial change in circumstances is shown, unless the future event is expressly specified in the court's order or the agreement of the parties incorporated into a court order. Provides that the parties may expressly specify in the agreement incorporated into a court order or the court may expressly specify in the order that the occurrence of a specific future event is contemplated and will not constitute a substantial change in circumstances to warrant modification of the order. Effective immediately.
Title
CHILD SUPPORT-MAINTENANCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0823 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Effective Date May 13, 2022 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-002 |
2022-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 016-000-000 |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2022-02-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 17, 2022 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 1, 2022 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 006-000-000 |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
750 | 5 | 505 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 5 | 510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |