IL SB3036 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0886
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Auction License Act, the Community Association Manager Licensing and Disciplinary Act, the Real Estate License Act of 2000, and the Real Estate Appraiser Licensing Act of 2002. Makes changes to the terms for members of the Auction Advisory Board, the Community Association Manager Licensing and Disciplinary Board, the Real Estate Administration and Disciplinary Board, and the Real Estate Appraisal Administration and Disciplinary Board. Provides that the members' terms shall be for 4 years and the term expires upon completion of the term. Provides that the Community Association Manager Licensing and Disciplinary Board that are serving on the Board on the effective date of the amendatory Act may serve the remainder of their unexpired terms. Provides that no member of the Real Estate Administration and Disciplinary Board shall be reappointed to the Board for a term that would cause his or her cumulative service to the Board to exceed 10 years (rather than 12 years). Makes changes to the appointment process for vacancies on the Auction Advisory Board, the Community Association Manager Licensing and Disciplinary Board, and the Real Estate Appraisal Administration and Disciplinary Board. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REALTY LICENSES-BOARDS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-14SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0886
2018-08-14SenateEffective Date August 14, 2018
2018-08-14SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-19SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-21SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-000-000
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 007-000-000
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-04-23HouseArrived in House
2018-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 041-000-000
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000
2018-03-01SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22540730-30Amended CodeCitation Text
22542725Amended CodeCitation Text
22545425-10Amended CodeCitation Text
22545825-10Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback