IL SB3036 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-03 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-03 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Solid Waste Management Act. Repeals a provision that created the informational clearinghouse under the Act.
Title
SOLID WASTE MGMT-CLEARINGHOUSE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-03 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2016-04-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 20, 2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2016 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 007-000-000 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 20 | 5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |