IL SB3033 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Industrial Development Assistance Law. Allows local school districts and community colleges to apply for and receive grants under the Act for the acquisition of land, construction of facilities, and purchase of equipment, dedicated solely to the instruction of occupations in manufacturing. Provides additional eligibility requirements for local school districts and community colleges applying for grants under the Act. Modifies the term "industrial development agency" to include local school districts and community colleges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INDUSTRY DEVELOPMNT ASSISTANCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-10HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-10HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-05-03HouseArrived in House
2018-05-02SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Weaver
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 011-000-000
2018-04-18SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 010-000-000
2018-04-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
307203Amended CodeCitation Text
307206Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback