IL SB3031 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0729
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Energy Efficient Building Act. Provides that the International Code Council's International Energy Conservation Code, as adopted by the Capital Development Board, shall also apply to certain State facilities beginning on the effective date of the amendatory Act. Amends the Green Buildings Act. Removes provisions providing that construction and major renovation projects must achieve the highest level of certification practical within the project budget. Provides that new State-funded building construction and major renovations of existing State-owned facilities must be designed to achieve, at a minimum, the silver certification of the Leadership in Energy and Environmental Design's rating system or an equivalent standard. Amends the Capital Development Board Act. Repeals a Section of the Act concerning the adoption of a statewide energy code. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GREEN BUILDINGS-REQUIREMENTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-03SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0729
2018-08-03SenateEffective Date August 3, 2018
2018-08-03SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-22SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-05-25SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-003-000
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Energy Committee; 008-000-000
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Energy Committee
2018-04-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-18HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-04-18HouseArrived in House
2018-04-18SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass State Government; 006-000-000
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20310510.09-5Repealed CodeCitation Text
20312520Amended CodeCitation Text
20313010Amended CodeCitation Text
20313015Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback