IL SB3029 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Contract Fraud Act. Exempts from certain penalties under the Act projects constructed by the Department of Transportation where title to all the lands needed and where full legal possession has not been obtained as provided but a right of entry to occupy and to use the property has been voluntarily obtained in the name of the State of Illinois, through the Department, from the property owner. Provides that certain provisions concerning spending money without obtaining title to the land do not apply to any public work or improvement project by the Department or the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority and constructed using specified methods. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUBLIC CONTRACT-IDOT PROJECTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-04SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-17SenatePostponed - Transportation
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-09SenatePostponed - Transportation
2018-05-03SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-02SenatePostponed - Transportation
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-24SenatePostponed - Transportation
2018-04-17SenatePostponed - Transportation
2018-04-17SenateWaive Posting Notice
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-11SenatePostponed - Transportation
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
305452Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback