IL SB3027 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Finance Act. Provides that beginning after June 1, 2017, the chief operating officer of Amtrak or its successor shall no longer be required to certify to the State Treasurer the number of Amtrak tickets sold at the State rate during the current fiscal year. Provides that beginning July 1, 2017, the State Treasurer shall no longer be required to transfer from the General Revenue Fund to the Intercity Passenger Rail Fund an amount equal to the tickets certified by the chief operating officer of Amtrak multiplied by $50. Amends the General Obligation Bond Act. Modifies the money received by the Department of Transportation under a Section concerning appropriation of proceeds from the sale of bonds. Amends the Downstate Public Transportation Act. Modifies the maximum eligible operating expenses for various participants under the Act. Modifies the transfer of funds by the Department of Transportation under a Section concerning residual fund balance. Amends the Motor Fuel Tax Law. Provides for the costs of the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency for the administration of the Vehicle Emissions Inspection Law of 2005 to be paid by the State Comptroller and Treasurer from the Motor Fuel Tax Fund into the Vehicle Inspection Fund. Amends the Regional Transportation Authority Act, the Clerks of Courts Act, and the Unified Code of Corrections to provide that all moneys in the Roadside Memorial Fund shall be used by the Department of Veterans' Affairs to pay for the cartage and erection of veterans' headstones. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IDOT-FINANCE & FUNDS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-14HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-05-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-10HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-09HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-05-09HouseArrived in House
2018-05-09SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; McConnaughay
2018-05-09SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-08SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 014-000-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Transportation; 011-000-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301056z-68Amended CodeCitation Text
3033013Amended CodeCitation Text
307402-15Amended CodeCitation Text
307402-2.04Amended CodeCitation Text
355058Amended CodeCitation Text
7036154.09Amended CodeCitation Text
70510527.5Amended CodeCitation Text
70510527.6Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.18Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback