IL SB3023 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Community-Law Enforcement Partnership for Deflection and Addiction Treatment Act. Allows a law enforcement agency to establish a program to facilitate contact between a person and a licensed substance abuse treatment provider for assessment and coordination of treatment. Requires the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority, in conjunction with a Police Chief's Association and Department of Human Services to develop the type of data to collect and measure performance of program. Provides for civil liability immunity and eligibility for funding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SUBSTANCE ABUSE DEFLECTION PRG

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-05-16HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-05-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-25HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bush
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 007-000-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Human Services; 008-000-000
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-03-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback