IL SB3023 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-03 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-03 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Higher Education Cooperation Act. Provides that the purpose of the Act is to promote interinstitutional cooperation and collaboration, which may involve public-private partnerships leveraging the use of public and private resources to improve outcomes for the higher educational system in this State. Provides that an institution of higher education may participate in the establishment and operation of programs of interinstitutional cooperation with other institutions of higher education or public-private partnerships, or both (instead of allowing a public institution of higher education to participate in the establishment and operation of programs of interinstitutional cooperation with other public institutions of higher education or with nonpublic institutions of higher education or with both public and nonpublic institutions of higher education). Provides that the program of financial assistance is available to public-private partnerships. Provides that the Board of Higher Education may require matching public or private resources from all participants. Makes related changes. Effective July 1, 2016.
Title
HIGHER ED COOPERATION
Sponsors
Sen. Pat McGuire [D] | Rep. Kelly Burke [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-03 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2016-04-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 20, 2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2016 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Higher Education; 009-000-000 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 220 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 220 | 2.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 220 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 220 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |