IL SB3022 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. In a provision that allows a manufacturer, distributor, or importing distributor to provide signs to a retailer if certain conditions are met, including a limitation on the dollar value of the signs that may be provided, provides that the cost adjustment factor applied to the limitation on the dollar value of the signs is 5% annually (rather than the change in the consumer price index or 5%, whichever is greater). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LIQUOR-SIGNS TO RETAILERS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-001-000
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-05-04HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-05-04HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2018-05-04HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-04HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-04HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 043-002-003
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Muñoz
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 012-002-001
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass Executive; 017-000-000
2018-03-01SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23556-6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback