IL SB3019 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0885
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that a manufacturer of beer that imports beer into this State must obtain a non-resident dealer's license and comply with certain provisions concerning recordkeeping and taxation. Provides that nothing in the Act prohibits an Illinois licensed distributor from offering credit or a refund for unused, salable alcoholic liquors to a holder of a special event retailer's license or special use permit license or from the special event retailer's licensee or special use permit licensee accepting the credit or refund of alcoholic liquors at the conclusion of the event specified in the license. Makes changes to provisions concerning signage, including raising the limit on the cost of signs that may be provided to a retailer and removing the cost adjustment factor for the limit on the cost of signs that may be provided to a retailer. Provides that all permanent inside signs, except alcohol lists and menus, are the property of the manufacturer, distributor, or the importing distributor and shall be returned to the manufacturer, distributor, or the importing distributor upon request. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LIQUOR-VARIOUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-14SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0885
2018-08-14SenateEffective Date August 14, 2018
2018-08-14SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-22SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-25SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-001-000
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-04-25HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass as Amended Executive; 017-000-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-03-01SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23555-1Amended CodeCitation Text
23556-4Amended CodeCitation Text
23556-6Amended CodeCitation Text
23556-8Amended CodeCitation Text
23558-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback