IL SB3016 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nuclear Safety Law of 2004. Removes certain provisions concerning the Illinois Emergency Management Agency's powers over nuclear steam-generating facility inspectors. Defines "nuclear steam-generating facility" for provisions concerning boiler and pressure vessel safety. Amends the Illinois Nuclear Safety Preparedness Act. Defines "nuclear steam-generating facility" and corrects a cross-reference. Effective immediately.
Title
NUCLEAR SAFETY-INSPECTORS
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rezin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3310 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
420 | 5 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
420 | 5 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3016&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3016.htm |