IL SB3015 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. With regard to the self-administration and self-carry of asthma medication, provides that a school district, public school, charter school, or nonpublic school may authorize a school nurse or trained personnel to (i) provide undesignated asthma medication to a student for self-administration only or to any personnel authorized under a student's Individual Health Care Action Plan or asthma action plan, plan pursuant to Section 504 of the federal Rehabilitation Act of 1973, or individualized education program plan to administer to the student that meets the student's prescription on file, (ii) administer an undesignated asthma medication that meets the prescription on file to any student who has an Individual Health Care Action Plan or asthma action plan, plan pursuant to Section 504 of the federal Rehabilitation Act of 1973, or individualized education program plan that authorizes the use of asthma medication; and (iii) administer an undesignated asthma medication to any person that the school nurse or trained personnel believes in good faith is having respiratory distress; defines "undesignated asthma medication" and "respiratory distress". Changes the definition of "asthma medication" to mean quick-relief asthma medication that is approved by the United States Food and Drug Administration for the treatment of respiratory distress. Provides that a school nurse or trained personnel may administer undesignated asthma medication to any person whom the school nurse or trained personnel in good faith believes to be experiencing respiratory distress (i) while in school, (ii) while at a school-sponsored activity, (iii) while under the supervision of school personnel, or (iv) before or after normal school activities. Provides that a school district, public school, charter school, or nonpublic school may maintain a supply of an asthma medication in any secure location where a person is most at risk. Provides that a training curriculum to recognize and respond to respiratory distress may be conducted online or in person. Specifies training requirements. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-ASTHMA MEDICATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-25SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-04-25HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-04-17SenateDo Pass as Amended Education; 012-000-000
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2018-04-11SenatePostponed - Education
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Education
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-03-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Education
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Education
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Education
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105522-30Amended CodeCitation Text
105527A-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback