IL SB3015 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-1)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0726
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-1)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0726
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. With regard to the self-administration and self-carry of asthma medication, provides that a school district, public school, charter school, or nonpublic school may authorize a school nurse or trained personnel to (i) provide undesignated asthma medication to a student for self-administration only or to any personnel authorized under a student's Individual Health Care Action Plan or asthma action plan, plan pursuant to Section 504 of the federal Rehabilitation Act of 1973, or individualized education program plan to administer to the student that meets the student's prescription on file, (ii) administer an undesignated asthma medication that meets the prescription on file to any student who has an Individual Health Care Action Plan or asthma action plan, plan pursuant to Section 504 of the federal Rehabilitation Act of 1973, or individualized education program plan that authorizes the use of asthma medication; and (iii) administer an undesignated asthma medication to any person that the school nurse or trained personnel believes in good faith is having respiratory distress; defines "undesignated asthma medication" and "respiratory distress". Changes the definition of "asthma medication" to mean quick-relief asthma medication that is approved by the United States Food and Drug Administration for the treatment of respiratory distress. Provides that a school nurse or trained personnel may administer undesignated asthma medication to any person whom the school nurse or trained personnel in good faith believes to be experiencing respiratory distress (i) while in school, (ii) while at a school-sponsored activity, (iii) while under the supervision of school personnel, or (iv) before or after normal school activities. Provides that a school district, public school, charter school, or nonpublic school may maintain a supply of an asthma medication in any secure location where a person is most at risk. Provides that a training curriculum to recognize and respond to respiratory distress may be conducted online or in person. Specifies training requirements. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-ASTHMA MEDICATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0726 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 012-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Education |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Education |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 22-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27A-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |