IL SB3009 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Cemetery Association Act. Provides that the board of trustees of a cemetery located in DuPage, Kane, Kendall, Lake, McHenry, or Will county shall provide notice of vacancies to the presiding officer of the township in which the cemetery is located rather than to the presiding officer of the county. Provides that the presiding officer so notified shall appoint a person to fill the vacancy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CEMETERY-VACANCY-NOTICE-TWP

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-28SenateBill Dead - Amendatory Veto
2018-11-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 14, 2018
2018-08-17SenateGovernor Amendatory Veto
2018-06-19SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-21SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 007-000-000
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Counties & Townships Committee
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-23HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-04-23HouseArrived in House
2018-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 045-000-000
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Local Government; 008-000-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2018-03-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Local Government
2018-03-01SenateAssigned to Local Government
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8053204Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback