IL SB3007 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Personal Information Protection Act. Provides that a data collector required to report breaches to more than 100 Illinois residents as a result of a single breach must also report to the Attorney General. Provides that the Attorney General shall report annually to the General Assembly specified information concerning breaches of data security by February 1 of each year.
Title
PERSONAL INFORMATION REPORT GA
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-01-06 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 530 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 530 | 55 | New Code | See Bill Text |