IL SB3005 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0996
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0996
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that the Electric Vehicle Permitting Task Force shall include one member representing a statewide organization of municipalities as authorized under specified provisions of the Illinois Municipal Code.
Title
ELECTRIC VEHICLE TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Stadelman [D] | Sen. John Connor [D] | Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel [D] | Rep. Dave Vella [D] |
Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0996 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Effective Date May 27, 2022 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2022-04-06 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Energy and Public Utilities; 013-000-000 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Energy and Public Utilities; 013-000-000 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Energy and Public Utilities |
2022-04-04 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Energy and Public Utilities |
2022-03-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2022-03-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - March 30, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2022-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-003-000 |
2022-03-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2022-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-22 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 022-000-000 |
2022-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Energy & Environment Committee; by Voice Vote |
2022-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Energy & Environment Committee; by Voice Vote |
2022-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee |
2022-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella |
2022-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-18 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2022-02-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 16, 2022 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Energy and Public Utilities; 019-000-000 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 52.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |