IL SB3005 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Administrative Review Law of the Code of Civil Procedure. In the definition of "administrative decision", changes references to "parties" to "persons". Provides that administrative decisions made reviewable by statute and final administrative decisions for which there is no other adequate remedy in a court are subject to judicial review. Provides that a person suffering legal wrong because of an administrative decision, or adversely affected or aggrieved by an administrative decision, is entitled to judicial review of the administrative decision. Provides that the Administrative Review Law shall apply to and govern every action to review judicially a final decision of any administrative agency unless the action is governed by the procedures or provisions of another statute. Strikes language concerning the scope of the Administrative Review Law. Provides that every action to review a final administrative decision shall be commenced by the filing of a complaint and the issuance of summons within 60 (instead of 35) days from the date that a copy of the decision sought to be reviewed was served upon the party affected by the decision. Makes other changes in Sections concerning commencement of action; defendants; scope of review; powers of the circuit court; and direct review of administrative orders by the appellate court. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW-VARIOUS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-03-13SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2018
2018-02-27SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 010-002-000
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73553-101Amended CodeCitation Text
73553-101.5New CodeSee Bill Text
73553-102Amended CodeCitation Text
73553-103Amended CodeCitation Text
73553-107Amended CodeCitation Text
73553-110Amended CodeCitation Text
73553-111Amended CodeCitation Text
73553-113Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback