IL SB3004 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Vital Records Act. Provides that a person shall not be required to pay a search fee for a birth record search or an additional fee for a certified copy of the record upon the person's placement on aftercare release under the Juvenile Court Act of 1987, upon release on parole, mandatory supervised release, final discharge, or pardon from the Department of Juvenile Justice if the person presents a specified form completed by the Department of Juvenile Justice. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BIRTH RECORDS-DEPT JUV JUST

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-18HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-04-18HouseArrived in House
2018-04-18SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2018
2018-02-27SenateDo Pass Public Health; 006-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Public Health
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41053525Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback