IL SB3003 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Adds a state of Mexico to the definition of "state". Provides that an applicant for a school bus driving permit cannot have been convicted of committing or attempting to commit specific offenses under the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that an applicant cannot have been convicted of committing or attempting to commit a felony under the Cannabis Control Act. Provides that an applicant cannot have been convicted of committing or attempting to commit a felony under the Illinois Controlled Substances Act, the Methamphetamine Control and Community Protection Act, or the Methamphetamine Precursor Control Act. Provides that an applicant cannot have been convicted of committing or attempting to commit a felony under the Liquor Control Act of 1934.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-SCH BUS DRIVER PERMITS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 048-001-000
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-04-24SenateDo Pass as Amended Transportation; 014-000-000
2018-04-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation
2018-04-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2018-04-18SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-18SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-04-17SenatePostponed - Transportation
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-11SenatePostponed - Transportation
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Transportation
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62551-195Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-106.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback