IL SB3002 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Innovations for Transportation Infrastructure Act. Contains a statement of legislative policy. Defines terms. Adds provisions governing: authorization of project delivery methods; preconditions to commencement of procurement; procurement; evaluation and selection of proposals; project records; confidentiality; public disclosure; design-build contracts; construction manager/general contractor contracts; funding and financing; minority, disadvantaged, and women-owned businesses; acquisition of property; federal requirements; powers of the Department of Transportation and the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority; and rulemaking. Makes corresponding changes in the Department of Transportation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois; the Illinois Finance Authority Act; the Illinois Procurement Code; the Public Construction Bond Act; the Employment of Illinois Workers on Public Works Act; the Business Enterprise for Minorities, Women, and Persons with Disabilities Act; the Toll Highway Act; the Eminent Domain Act; and the Prevailing Wage Act. Provides that the provisions of the Act are severable. Effective immediately.
Title
INFRASTRUCTURE DESIGN BUILD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2705 | 2705-233 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 3501 | 825-108 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 500 | 1-10.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 550 | 1.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 570 | 2.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 575 | 2.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
605 | 10 | 11.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
735 | 30 | 15-5-48 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 130 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |