IL SB3001 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Provides that the Department of Transportation shall allow the use of asphalt rejuvenating agents and binder performance grade modifiers in mix designs used for the construction and maintenance of State highways. Provides that all asphalt roofing shingles used in Department projects shall be from recycling facilities that are approved by the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency and that are in compliance with operational guidelines and asbestos-testing requirements.
Title
HWY CD-MIX DESIGNS-ASPHALT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sandoval |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 013-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 011-000-000 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
605 | 5 | 4-221 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
605 | 5 | 4-222 | Amended Code | Citation Text |