IL SB2999 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Wage Payment and Collection Act. Provides that an employer shall reimburse an employee for all necessary expenditures or losses incurred by the employee directly related to services performed for the employer. Requires the Department of Labor to adopt rules implementing the requirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WAGE PAYMENT-EXPENSES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Standard Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 016-012-000
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-002-000
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Van Pelt
2018-04-25SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Labor; 014-000-000
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 1, 2018
2018-02-28SenateDo Pass Labor; 014-002-000
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Labor
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8201159.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback