IL SB2999 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1094
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Wage Payment and Collection Act. Provides that an employer shall reimburse an employee for all necessary expenditures or losses incurred by the employee directly related to services performed for the employer. Requires the Department of Labor to adopt rules implementing the requirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WAGE PAYMENT-EXPENSES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-26SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1094
2018-08-26SenateEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-26SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 052-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 114-001-000
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 023-000-000
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Standard Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 016-012-000
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-002-000
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Van Pelt
2018-04-25SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Labor; 014-000-000
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 1, 2018
2018-02-28SenateDo Pass Labor; 014-002-000
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Labor
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8201159.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2999&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2999.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2999eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2999enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-1094.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2999sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2999ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2999ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2999_04252018_038000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB2999_05302018_038000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2999ham002_05312018_055000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback