IL SB2999 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1094
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1094
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Wage Payment and Collection Act. Provides that an employer shall reimburse an employee for all necessary expenditures or losses incurred by the employee directly related to services performed for the employer. Requires the Department of Labor to adopt rules implementing the requirement.
Title
WAGE PAYMENT-EXPENSES
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin [D] |
Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Litesa Wallace [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1094 |
2018-08-26 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 052-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 114-001-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 023-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 016-012-000 |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-002-000 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Van Pelt |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Labor; 014-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 1, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Do Pass Labor; 014-002-000 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |