IL SB2996 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Lead Poisoning Prevention Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEVATED BLOOD LEAD LEVEL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-06-19SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-21SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-23HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-23HouseArrived in House
2018-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 043-000-000
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Public Health; 006-001-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Public Health
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-03-01SenateAssigned to Public Health
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
410451Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback