IL SB2996 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0723
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0723
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Lead Poisoning Prevention Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
ELEVATED BLOOD LEAD LEVEL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0723 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000 |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-04-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 043-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 006-001-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 45 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |