IL SB2989 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0822
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0822
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Allows a member to establish credit for up to 2 years of service as a teacher or administrator employed by a private school registered with or recognized by the Illinois State Board of Education, provided that the teacher (i) was certified under the law governing the certification of teachers at the time the service was rendered, (ii) applies in writing no later than 2 years after the effective date of the amendatory Act, (iii) supplies satisfactory evidence of the employment, (iv) completes at least 10 years of contributing service as a teacher, (v) pays the required contribution required, and (vi) does not receive credit for that service under any other provision of the Code. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement by the State. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-CTPF-PRIVATE SCHOOL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0822 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Effective Date May 13, 2022 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-010-000 |
2022-03-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Kelly |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2022-03-23 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2022-03-23 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2022-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 006-002-000 |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2022-02-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 17, 2022 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 8, 2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Pensions; 006-000-000 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Pensions |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Pensions |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 17-133 | Amended Code | Citation Text |