IL SB2984 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0821
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0821
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Modifies requirements concerning entrepreneurship assistance centers to include assistance to youth entrepreneurs. Defines "youth entrepreneur". Makes conforming changes.
Title
DCEO-YOUTH ENTREPRENEUR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0821 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2022-03-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2022-03-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2022-03-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2022-03-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2022-03-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2022-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-16 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2022-02-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 16, 2022 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 009-000-000 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 605 | 605-503 | Amended Code | Citation Text |