IL SB2981 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1094
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1094
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes: Changes the definition of "progressive design-build project delivery method" to include the negotiations of the contract price can contain either a lump sum or a guaranteed maximum price (instead of either a lump sum or a guaranteed minimum price). Adds a provision that the Act shall be excepted from Illinois Public Contract Fraud Act. In provisions regarding the Illinois Department of Transportation or the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority offering to pay stipends, changes a provision allowing payment after the proposal has been released, but before the due date for proposals (instead of before the due date for proposals). In provisions regarding taxpayer accountability, adds a provision limiting the provisions to any project with an estimated cost over $30,000,000. Removes provisions requiring the firm to be prequalified in Construction Inspection. Adds a provision requiring the implementation of a disadvantaged business enterprise program to include minority-owned and women-owned businesses and disadvantaged businesses when applicable under federal law. Adds provisions establishing a disadvantaged business enterprise liaison. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
INFRASTRUCTURE DESIGN BUILD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1094 |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Effective Date June 15, 2022 |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-001 |
2022-03-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2022-03-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2022-03-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2022-02-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Villivalam |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 24, 2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 23, 2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 017-000-000 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As February 25, 2022 |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As February 18, 2022 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2705 | 2705-233 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 3501 | 825-108 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 500 | 1-10.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 550 | 1.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 570 | 2.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 575 | 2.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
605 | 10 | 11.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
735 | 30 | 15-5-48 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 130 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |