IL SB2978 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 To Local Government Subcommittee on Amendments |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2012 |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 605 | 605-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |