IL SB2975 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Broadband Procurement and Disclosure Act. Provides that no State broadband purchaser may award any contract to an Internet service provider that includes broadband service unless the contract provides specified terms concerning access to and impairment of Internet services. Requires each Internet service provider to make available on its website a clear and conspicuous statement informing end users of the Internet service provider's network management practices and performance, including commercial terms offered to end users. Provides enforcement and damages provisions. Provides that nothing in the Act supersedes any obligation or authorization or limits the ability of an Internet service provider to address the needs of emergency communications or law enforcement, public safety, or national security authorities consistent with or as permitted by applicable law. Provides legislative findings. Defines terms.
Title
BROADBAND PROCURE & DISCLOSURE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-01-06 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2975&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2975.htm |