IL SB2974 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides that the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board shall require police training schools to teach identification of victims of human trafficking. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides for enhanced penalties for human trafficking crimes when the victim is under 18 years of age at the time of the offense. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Prohibits the admissibility of evidence in prosecution for trafficking of the prior sexual activities or reputation of the victim. Amends the Sex Offender Registration Act. Includes in the definition of "sex offense" involuntary sexual servitude of a minor and trafficking in persons. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections concerning fines for certain sexual offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HUMAN TRAFFICKING-PENALTIES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-02-27SenateTo Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
507057Amended CodeCitation Text
720510-9Amended CodeCitation Text
720511-14.1Amended CodeCitation Text
720511-18.1Amended CodeCitation Text
720536-1Amended CodeCitation Text
7255115-7Amended CodeCitation Text
7255124B-100Amended CodeCitation Text
7301502Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-9-1.21Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback