IL SB2970 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Authorizes a brewer, class 1 brewer, or class 2 brewer to sell beer manufactured by any other brewer, class 1 brewer, or class 2 brewer to non-licensees and to sell cider. Authorizes a distributor licensee to sell beer, cider, or both beer and cider to brewers, class 1 brewers, and class 2 brewers that, pursuant to a specified provision of the Act, sell beer, cider, or both beer and cider to non-licensees at their breweries. Provides that (i) a person licensed to make wine under the laws of another state who has a winery shipper's license and annually produces less than 25,000 gallons of wine or (ii) a person who has a first-class or second-class wine manufacturer's license, a first-class or second-class wine-maker's license, or a limited wine manufacturer's license and annually produces less than 25,000 gallons of wine may make application to the Commission for a self-distribution exemption to allow the sale of wine to brewers, class 1 brewers, and class 2 brewers that, pursuant to a specified provision of the Act, sell beer, cider, or both beer and cider to non-licensees at their breweries. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LIQUOR-BREWERS-SALE AT RETAIL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-03HouseArrived in House
2018-05-02SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; T. Cullerton
2018-05-02SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass Executive; 017-000-000
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis
2018-03-01SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-02-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23553-12Amended CodeCitation Text
23555-1Amended CodeCitation Text
23556-4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback