IL SB2970 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Authorizes a brewer, class 1 brewer, or class 2 brewer to sell beer manufactured by any other brewer, class 1 brewer, or class 2 brewer to non-licensees and to sell cider. Authorizes a distributor licensee to sell beer, cider, or both beer and cider to brewers, class 1 brewers, and class 2 brewers that, pursuant to a specified provision of the Act, sell beer, cider, or both beer and cider to non-licensees at their breweries. Provides that (i) a person licensed to make wine under the laws of another state who has a winery shipper's license and annually produces less than 25,000 gallons of wine or (ii) a person who has a first-class or second-class wine manufacturer's license, a first-class or second-class wine-maker's license, or a limited wine manufacturer's license and annually produces less than 25,000 gallons of wine may make application to the Commission for a self-distribution exemption to allow the sale of wine to brewers, class 1 brewers, and class 2 brewers that, pursuant to a specified provision of the Act, sell beer, cider, or both beer and cider to non-licensees at their breweries. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
LIQUOR-BREWERS-SALE AT RETAIL
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] | Sen. Jason Barickman [R] | Sen. Jim Oberweis [R] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] |
Sen. John Curran [R] | Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; T. Cullerton |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 017-000-000 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 3-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 5-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 6-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |