IL SB2969 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-3)
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1093
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-3)
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1093
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code to provide that a group or individual policy of accident and health insurance or managed care plan that is amended, delivered, issued, or renewed on or after January 1, 2023 shall provide coverage for continuous glucose monitors. Makes conforming changes in the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971, the Counties Code, the Illinois Municipal Code, the School Code, the Health Maintenance Organization Act, the Limited Health Service Organization Act, the Voluntary Health Services Plans Act, and the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code.
Title
INS-GLUCOSE MONITOR MANDATE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1093 |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2022-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2022-04-06 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2022-04-06 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-04-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-04-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 016-000-000 |
2022-03-31 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2022-03-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-25 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2022-03-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2022-03-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-03-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-03-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2022-03-14 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2022-03-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2022-03-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2022-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2022-02-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Morrison |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 011-000-000 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 23, 2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 1, 2022 |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 012-000-000 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-12-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.3f | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 125 | 5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 130 | 4003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 165 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 356z.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 5-16.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 6.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1069.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 10-4-2.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |