IL SB2969 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-8)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Board of Higher Education Act. In the provision governing the graduation incentive grant program, removes the requirement that the Board of Higher Education annually submit to the Governor and the General Assembly a budgetary recommendation for the grants and the requirement that the Board notify applicants that the award of grants is contingent upon the availability of appropriated funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIGHER ED-GRAD GRANT PROGRAM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion Filed to Table Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-05-28HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 017-000-000
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
2018-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 014-002-000
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2018-04-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-18HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-04-18HouseArrived in House
2018-04-18SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2018
2018-02-27SenateDo Pass Higher Education; 011-000-000
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Paul Schimpf

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1102059.28Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback