IL SB2969 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-8)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-8)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Board of Higher Education Act. In the provision governing the graduation incentive grant program, removes the requirement that the Board of Higher Education annually submit to the Governor and the General Assembly a budgetary recommendation for the grants and the requirement that the Board notify applicants that the award of grants is contingent upon the availability of appropriated funds.
Title
HIGHER ED-GRAD GRANT PROGRAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion Filed to Table Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2018-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2018-05-28 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 017-000-000 |
2018-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2018-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 014-002-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-18 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-04-18 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 011-000-000 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Paul Schimpf |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 205 | 9.28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |