IL SB2969 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-10 - Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-10 - Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a county to which the Illinois Commercial Relocation of Trespassing Vehicles Law applies may, by resolution, choose to be excluded from the application of the Illinois Commercial Safety Towing Law in that county and that, upon adoption of such a resolution by the county board, the county clerk shall certify to the Illinois Commerce Commission that the county board has adopted the resolution. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-TOWING-EXCLUDE COUNTY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-10 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-11-10 | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000 | |
2010-11-10 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 11, 2011 | |
2010-05-28 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-05-07 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-05-05 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-28 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation, Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 015-000-000 | |
2010-04-28 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation, Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2010-04-28 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Transportation, Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee | |
2010-04-22 | Assigned to Transportation, Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee | |
2010-04-22 | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-11 | First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2010-03-11 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-10 | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 | |
2010-03-09 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 10, 2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 4, 2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Do Pass Consumer Protection; 006-000-000 | |
2010-03-02 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Rutherford | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Consumer Protection | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-03 | First Reading | |
2010-02-03 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |