IL SB2968 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Community College Act. Provides that the board of trustees of a community college district may enter into a contract for goods or services procured from a competitively bid group purchase contract without adhering to the competitively bid contract requirements under the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMMUNITY COLLEGE-CONTRACTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-04-20HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-20HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-04-18HouseArrived in House
2018-04-18SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2018
2018-02-27SenateDo Pass Higher Education; 011-000-000
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1108053-27.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback