IL SB2966 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-15 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-15 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Treasurer Act. Provides that "qualified expenses" for purposes of the College Savings Pool includes expenses for tuition in connection with enrollment or attendance at an elementary or secondary public, private, or religious school, as allowed under the Internal Revenue Code. Effective immediately.
Title
TREASURER-COLLEGE SAVINGS POOL
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-12-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 505 | 16.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2966&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2966.htm |