IL SB2963 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0743
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that if active employment is a condition of a policy of group life insurance, in order to be delivered in the State the policy must contain provisions that state that continued coverage for specified active employees will remain in effect until the earliest of specified dates, and specified obligations of the replacing carrier may be limited to the amount for which the employee was covered under the prior carrier's group life insurance policy and may be reduced by any amounts payable under the prior carrier's group life insurance policy. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS-GROUP LIFE INSURANCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-06SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0743
2022-05-06SenateEffective Date May 6, 2022
2022-05-06SenateGovernor Approved
2022-04-26SenateSent to the Governor
2022-03-28SenatePassed Both Houses
2022-03-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
2022-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2022-03-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2022-03-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2022-03-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 014-000-000
2022-03-07HouseAssigned to Insurance Committee
2022-02-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2022-02-24HouseFirst Reading
2022-02-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
2022-02-23HouseArrived in House
2022-02-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2022-02-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 17, 2022
2022-02-16SenateSecond Reading
2022-02-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 15, 2022
2022-02-10SenateDo Pass Insurance; 012-000-000
2022-01-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2022-01-05SenateAssigned to Insurance
2021-12-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-12-15SenateFirst Reading
2021-12-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155231.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback